WI AB114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-32)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 40.51 (15m), 632.86 and 632.865 (title) and (1); to renumber 632.865 (2); to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 601.43 (1) (a), 609.83, 616.09 (1) (a) 2. and 628.36 (2m) (e) 1.; and to create 628.36 (2m) (a) 2s., 632.861 and chapter 649 of the statutes; Relating to: registration and regulation of pharmacy benefit managers, drug pricing transparency, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration and regulation of pharmacy benefit managers, drug pricing transparency, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Mark Born [R]Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Ed Brooks [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]
Rep. Dave Considine [D]Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]Rep. James Edming [R]
Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]
Rep. Rob Hutton [R]Rep. Jesse James [R]Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Dan Knodl [R]
Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R]Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]
Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]
Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R]Rep. Kevin Petersen [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]
Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]
Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. John Spiros [R]
Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Rob Stafsholt [R]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]
Rep. Amanda Stuck [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]
Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]
Rep. Travis Tranel [R]Rep. Nancy Vander Meer [R]Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Jill Billings [D]
Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Roger Roth [R]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]
Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. David Hansen [D]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]
Sen. Christopher Larson [D]Sen. Howard Marklein [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]
Sen. Jeff Smith [D]Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]
Sen. Robert Wirch [D]

Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-03-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-03-10SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2020-03-10SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services
2020-02-19SenateRepresentative Hintz added as a coauthor
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseRepresentatives Wichgers and Nygren added as coauthors
2020-02-18HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-18HouseDecision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 60, Noes 36
2020-02-18HouseDecision of the Chair appealed
2020-02-18HousePoint of order that Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
2020-02-18HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, Kolste, Riemer, Subeck, Vining, Billings, Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Shankland, B. Meyers, L. Myers, Pope, Hebl, Stubbs, Zamarripa, Emerson, Brostoff, Cabrera, Vruwink, Haywood, Ohnstad, Goyke, C. Taylor, Sargent, Considine, Neubauer and Fields
2020-02-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-18HouseRead a second time
2020-02-17HouseRepresentatives Sanfelippo and Kurtz added as coauthors
2020-02-17HouseCommissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2020-02-13HouseRepresentative McGuire added as a coauthor
2020-02-13HousePlaced on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2020-02-13HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 5
2020-02-13HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 5
2020-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Health
2020-02-13HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-05HousePublic hearing held
2020-02-05HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa
2020-01-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-11-05HouseRepresentative Neubauer added as a coauthor
2019-09-27HouseRepresentative Milroy added as a coauthor
2019-09-19HouseSenator Cowles added as a cosponsor
2019-09-03HouseSenators Schachtner and Bewley added as cosponsors
2019-08-23HouseSenator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
2019-06-26HouseRepresentative Cabrera added as a coauthor
2019-06-21HouseRepresentative Wittke added as a coauthor
2019-05-16HouseRepresentative Macco added as a coauthor
2019-05-09HouseSenator Miller added as a cosponsor
2019-05-07HouseRepresentatives Gruszynski, Pope and Vining added as coauthors
2019-05-06HouseRepresentative Zamarripa added as a coauthor
2019-04-25HouseRepresentative Crowley added as a coauthor
2019-04-24HouseRepresentatives Pronschinske and Magnafici added as coauthors
2019-04-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-04-03HouseCommissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2019-03-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-27HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-25HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback