WI AB110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.407 (10) (title), 15.407 (10) (a) (intro.), 15.407 (18) (title), 15.407 (18) (a) (intro.), 101.023, 101.62 (title), 101.62 (1), 101.62 (2), 101.62 (3), 101.62 (4), 101.63 (10), 101.64 (3), 101.72 and 101.74 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: renaming the Dwelling Code Council the Uniform Dwelling Code Council and renaming the Building Code Council the Commercial Building Code Council.
Title
Renaming the Dwelling Code Council the Uniform Dwelling Code Council and renaming the Building Code Council the Commercial Building Code Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] |
Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Sen. Roger Roth [R] |
Sen. Paul Farrow [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-05-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-27 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2015-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2015-03-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab110 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB110.pdf |