WI AB11 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.51 (4) (a) 4., 118.51 (6) and 118.51 (7) (a); to renumber 118.51 (7) (b); and to amend 118.51 (3) (a) 4. and 118.51 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: open enrollment (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Public Instruction).
Title
Open enrollment (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Public Instruction).
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2017-01-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab11 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB11.pdf |