WI AB109 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Published 7-6-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Published 7-6-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 632.873 of the statutes; Relating to: fees for dental services.
Title
Fees for dental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Published 7-6-2013 |
2013-07-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-5-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 26 |
2013-07-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 7-3-2013 |
2013-05-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-10-2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 30, Noes 3 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-04-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-04-17 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 89, Noes 8 |
2013-04-17 | House | Record and vote on passage expunged |
2013-04-17 | House | Representatives Pope, Smith, Zepnick, Hintz, Hulsey, Shankland, C. Taylor, Hebl and Barnes added as coauthors |
2013-04-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Read a second time |
2013-04-16 | House | Representative Kleefisch added as a coauthor |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar 4-17-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-04-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2013-04-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-03-29 | House | Introduced |