WI AB1073 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 6.34 (1) (b), 6.87 (4) (a) 2., 16.84 (5) (d), 20.395 (2) (fq), 49.79 (9) (d) 1., 165.055 (3), 227.20 (3) (c), 227.46 (3) (a), 227.46 (8), 230.08 (2) (sb), 238.399 (3) (e), 601.83 (1) (b) and 601.85 (4); to renumber 227.138 (1) (a) to (h); to renumber and amend 13.90 (3), 15.165 (2), 49.79 (9) (d) 2., 71.07 (7) (b), 71.365 (1), 108.04 (2) (a) 3. (intro.), 108.04 (2) (a) 3. a. to c., 108.04 (2) (b), 165.08, 165.25 (6) (a), 227.135 (2), 227.135 (4), 227.137 (3) (e), 227.138 (1) (intro.), 227.40 (3) (intro.), 227.40 (3) (a) and 343.50 (1) (c); to consolidate, renumber and amend 6.34 (1) (intro.) and (a) and 6.87 (4) (a) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 5.02 (6m) (f), 5.02 (21), 5.05 (13) (c), 5.05 (13) (d) 1., 5.60 (8) (am), 6.22 (2) (b), 6.22 (2) (e), 6.22 (4) (a), 6.22 (4) (c), 6.24 (2), 6.24 (4) (c), 6.24 (4) (d), 6.24 (4) (e), 6.25 (1) (b), 6.276 (1), 6.86 (1) (b), 6.865 (1), 6.87 (2), 6.87 (3) (d), 6.87 (4) (b) 1., 6.88 (1), 6.97 (1), 7.08 (2) (d), 7.15 (1) (cm), 7.15 (1) (j), 8.12 (1), 8.12 (3), 10.02 (3) (b) 3., 10.06 (2) (d), 10.06 (2) (g), 11.0101 (32), 13.56 (2), 13.90 (2), 13.91 (1) (c), 20.445 (1) (b), 20.455 (1) (gh), 20.455 (2) (gb), 20.455 (3) (g), 45.57, 49.175 (2) (a), 49.175 (2) (c), 71.05 (6) (a) 14., 71.07 (7) (c), 71.36 (1), 73.03 (71), 77.51 (13g) (intro.), 106.05 (2) (b) (intro.), 106.05 (3) (a), 106.13 (3m) (b) (intro.), 106.18, 106.26 (3) (c) (intro.), 106.272 (1), 106.273 (3) (a) (intro.), 106.273 (3) (b), 106.275 (1) (a), 108.04 (2) (a) (intro.), 108.04 (2) (a) 1., 108.04 (2) (a) 2., 108.04 (2) (bm), 165.10, 165.25 (1), 165.25 (1m), 227.01 (13) (intro.), subchapter II (title) of chapter 227 [precedes 227.10], 227.11 (title), 227.13, 227.135 (3), 227.137 (2), 227.137 (4), 227.138 (2), 227.185, 227.20 (3) (a), 227.24 (1) (e) 1d., 227.24 (1) (e) 1g., 227.40 (1), 227.40 (2) (intro.), 227.40 (2) (e), 227.40 (3) (b) and (c), 227.40 (4) (a), 227.40 (6), 227.46 (1) (h), 227.46 (2), 227.46 (2m), 227.47 (1), 227.57 (11), 238.02 (1), 238.02 (2), 238.02 (3), 238.399 (3) (a), 281.665 (5) (d), 343.50 (3) (b), 601.83 (1) (a), 601.83 (1) (g), 601.83 (1) (h), 801.50 (3) (b), 806.04 (11), 809.13 and subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 893 [precedes 893.80]; to create 5.02 (12n), 5.02 (15m), 13.103, 13.124, 13.127, 13.365, 13.48 (24m), 13.90 (3) (a) and (b), 15.07 (1) (b) 24., 15.165 (2) (d) and (f) to (i), 16.42 (5), 16.84 (2m), 16.973 (15), 20.445 (1) (bz), 20.445 (1) (cg), 20.445 (1) (dg), 20.445 (1) (dr), 20.445 (1) (e), 20.445 (1) (fg), 20.445 (1) (fm), 20.940, 35.93 (2) (b) 3. im., 49.45 (2t), 49.45 (23b), 49.791, 71.05 (10) (dm), 71.07 (7) (b) 3., 71.21 (6), 71.365 (1) (b), 71.365 (4m), 71.775 (3) (a) 4., 73.03 (71) (d), 77.51 (13gm), 84.54, 86.51, 108.04 (2) (b) 1. (intro.), 108.04 (2) (b) 2. to 6., 108.04 (2) (bb), 108.04 (2) (bd), 165.07, 227.01 (3m), 227.05, 227.10 (2g), 227.11 (3), 227.112, 227.135 (1) (g), 227.135 (1) (h), 227.135 (2) (a) 2., 227.135 (4) (a) 1. to 6., 227.135 (6), 227.137 (2m), 227.137 (3) (e) 1. to 4., 227.137 (3m), 227.138 (1g), 227.18 (3m), 227.26 (2) (im), 227.47 (3), 238.04 (15), 238.399 (3) (am), 301.03 (16), 343.165 (8), 343.50 (1) (c) 2., 343.50 (3) (c), 601.83 (1) (i), 803.09 (2m) and 893.825 of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, section 9145 (4w); Relating to: legislative power and duties, state agency and authority composition and operations, administrative rule-making process, federal government waivers and approvals, unemployment insurance work search and registration requirements, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative power and duties, state agency and authority composition and operations, administrative rule-making process, federal government waivers and approvals, unemployment insurance work search and registration requirements, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-06HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-12-03HouseLRB correction
2018-12-03HousePublic hearing held
2018-11-30HouseRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2018-11-30HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback