WI AB107 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (5) (fs), 20.370 (5) (ft), 29.565 (title), 29.565 (1), 29.89 (title), 29.89 (2), 29.89 (3) (b), 29.89 (3) (d), 29.89 (3) (e), 29.89 (4) and 29.89 (5) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing reimbursement to counties for the costs incurred in processing and donating certain wild turkeys. (FE)
Title
Authorizing reimbursement to counties for the costs incurred in processing and donating certain wild turkeys. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 31 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-18-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Representatives Kahl and Jorgensen added as coauthors |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-02 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2015-04-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-01 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2015-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-23 | House | Representative Horlacher added as a coauthor |
2015-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-03-20 | House | Introduced |