WI AB104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 940.203 (3) (intro.), 940.203 (3) (a) and 940.203 (3) (b); and to create 940.203 (1) (ab) of the statutes; Relating to: battery or threat to an officer of the court in a tribal proceeding and providing a penalty.
Title
Battery or threat to an officer of the court in a tribal proceeding and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab104 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB104.pdf |