WI AB1038 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 60.11 (2) (b) and 108.07 (5); to renumber and amend 49.688 (1) (c), 70.47 (3) (aL), 108.04 (3), 108.062 (4) and 108.062 (19); to amend 13.101 (4), 20.866 (2) (xm), 40.22 (1), 40.22 (2m) (intro.), 40.22 (2r) (intro.), 40.22 (3) (intro.), 40.26 (1m) (a), 40.26 (1m) (b), 40.26 (5) (intro.), 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 71.01 (6) (L) 3., 71.22 (4) (L) 3., 71.22 (4m) (L) 3., 71.26 (2) (b) 12. d., 71.34 (1g) (L) 3., 71.42 (2) (L) 3., 71.98 (3), 74.35 (5) (c), 74.37 (4) (b), 108.04 (13) (d) 3. b., 108.04 (13) (d) 4. b., 108.062 (1) (b), 108.062 (3), 108.062 (15), 108.14 (8n) (e), 108.141 (7) (a), 108.16 (6m) (a), 115.385 (1) (intro.), 115.415 (1) (b), 115.999 (1) (d) 1., 115.999 (2m) (b) 1. a., 118.38 (2) (am) (intro.), 118.38 (3), 118.60 (7) (an) 1., 119.23 (7) (an) 1., 119.33 (2) (b) 3. b., 119.33 (2) (b) 3. c., 119.33 (5) (b) 2., 119.9002 (2) (d) 2. a., 119.9002 (2) (d) 2. b., 119.9002 (2) (d) 3. a., 119.9002 (2) (d) 3. b., 119.9004 (3) (b) 2., 120.13 (2) (g), 146.40 (3), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 450.11 (5) (a), 609.83, 625.12 (2), 628.34 (3) (a) and 895.51 (title); and to create 13.101 (4d), 40.26 (5m), 40.26 (6), 49.688 (1) (c) 2., 49.688 (10m), 60.11 (2) (b) 2., 70.47 (3) (aL) 2., 100.307, 102.03 (6), 102.565 (6), 103.13 (2m), 108.04 (2) (d), 108.04 (3) (b), 108.062 (2m), 108.062 (3r), 108.062 (4) (a) 2., 108.062 (19) (a) and (b), 108.062 (20), 108.07 (5) (bm), 115.385 (6), 115.7915 (8m), 118.38 (4), 118.60 (12), 119.23 (12), 153.23, 323.19 (3), 323.19 (4), 323.265, 323.2911, 323.2912, 323.2913, 323.2915, 440.08 (5), 450.11 (5) (br), 609.205, 609.846, 609.885, 632.729, 632.895 (14g), 632.895 (16v), 895.4801, 895.51 (1) (bd), 895.51 (1) (bg), 895.51 (1) (dp), 895.51 (2r) and 895.51 (3r) of the statutes; Relating to: state government response to the COVID-19 pandemic. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government response to the COVID-19 pandemic. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 adopted (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-05-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-05-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-05-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-04-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-04-15HousePublished 4-16-2020
2020-04-15HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-15-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 185
2020-04-15HousePresented to the Governor on 4-15-2020
2020-04-15HouseReport correctly enrolled on 4-15-2020
2020-04-15HouseLRB correction
2020-04-15HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 4)
2020-04-15HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-04-15SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-04-15SenateConcurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2020-04-15SenateMove to call the question, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2020-04-15SenateRead a third time
2020-04-15SenateRules suspended
2020-04-15SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-04-15SenateSenate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2020-04-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2020-04-15SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2020-04-15SenateRules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance
2020-04-15SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance
2020-04-15SenateRead a second time
2020-04-15SenateWithdrawn from Assembly message and taken up
2020-04-15SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Bewley, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Hansen, Johnson, Larson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Schachtner, Shilling, Smith, L. Taylor and Wirch
2020-04-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Bewley, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Hansen, Johnson, Larson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Schachtner, Shilling, Smith, L. Taylor and Wirch
2020-04-15SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Bewley, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Hansen, Johnson, Larson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Schachtner, Shilling, Smith, L. Taylor and Wirch
2020-04-14SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-04-14HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-04-14HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 2
2020-04-14HouseRules suspended
2020-04-14HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 4 adopted, Ayes 63, Noes 36
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Vos
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, B. Meyers, Zamarripa, Milroy, Cabrera, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Goyke, Billings, Fields, Riemer, Sargent, Pope, Ohnstad, Considine, Anderson, Hebl, Kolste, Vruwink, Emerson, Stubbs, Crowley, Stuck, Bowen, Neubauer and Sinicki
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Shankland, Brostoff, Emerson, Hebl, Stubbs, Cabrera, Zamarripa, Milroy, Anderson, Neubauer, Crowley, Riemer, Ohnstad, Goyke, Subeck, Pope, Kolste, Sargent, Considine, B. Meyers, Stuck, Fields, Vining, Billings, L. Myers and Sinicki
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36
2020-04-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Crowley, Considine, Emerson, Haywood, Hebl, Goyke, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Fields, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, C. Taylor, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa
2020-04-14HouseRead a second time
2020-04-13HouseRead first time and referred to calendar of 4-14-2020 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 (4)
2020-04-13HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1038
Texthttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB1038.pdf
Texthttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2019/REG/AB1038.pdf
Texthttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2019/185.pdf
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/av0173
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/av0174
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/av0175
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/av0176
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/av0177
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/sv0157
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/sv0158
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/sv0159
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/sv0160
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2019/sv0161

Bill Comments

feedback