WI AB1031 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.46 (1) (intro.) and 118.46 (1) (a) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: the Department of Public Instruction's model school policy on bullying by pupils.
Title
The Department of Public Instruction's model school policy on bullying by pupils.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-03-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-03-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nerison |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos |
2018-03-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to calendar of 3-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2018-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1031 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB1031.pdf |