WI AB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: exclusion of certain military allowances in determining gross income for purposes of child support.
Title
Exclusion of certain military allowances in determining gross income for purposes of child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab102 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB102.pdf |