WI AB102 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (5b) (d) 1., 71.07 (5d) (b) 2., 71.07 (5d) (d) 2., 71.10 (4) (gwb), 71.10 (4) (gx), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.28 (5b) (d) 1., 71.30 (3) (eop), 71.30 (3) (f), 71.47 (5b) (d) 1., 71.49 (1) (eop) and 71.49 (1) (f); and to create 20.835 (2) (ba), 71.07 (5b) (d) 1m., 71.07 (5b) (d) 4., 71.07 (5d) (b) 3., 71.07 (5d) (d) 2m., 71.07 (5d) (d) 5., 71.28 (5b) (d) 1m., 71.28 (5b) (d) 4., 71.47 (5b) (d) 1m. and 71.47 (5b) (d) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing refunds for the early stage seed and angel investment tax credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Allowing refunds for the early stage seed and angel investment tax credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs and the Economy and take up (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-03 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs and the Economy and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 61 |
2015-10-19 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2015-04-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2015-03-20 | House | Introduced |