WI AB1012 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.23 (4); to amend 48.20 (8) (a), 48.21 (3) (d), 48.213 (2) (d), 48.23 (3) and 977.075 (4); and to create 48.23 (2) (d), 48.23 (4) (c) and 48.23 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: the right of a parent to have counsel in a proceeding for a child alleged to be in need of protection or services; the power of the juvenile court to appoint counsel in such a proceeding; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
The right of a parent to have counsel in a proceeding for a child alleged to be in need of protection or services; the power of the juvenile court to appoint counsel in such a proceeding; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Mandela Barnes [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] | Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D] |
Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-04-05 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2016-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1012 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB1012.pdf |