WI AB1008 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 301.45 (1p) (a), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. and 973.015 (1m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: expunging a court record of certain offenses a person committed before he or she reached the age of 25. (FE)
Title
Expunging a court record of certain offenses a person committed before he or she reached the age of 25. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Mandela Barnes [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] | Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D] |
Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-04-05 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2016-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1008 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB1008.pdf |