WI AB1005 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 115.28 (7g) (b); to amend 118.19 (3) (a); and to create 115.28 (7g) (b) 1. to 3. and 118.19 (19) of the statutes; Relating to: student teaching requirement for teacher preparatory programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Student teaching requirement for teacher preparatory programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shelton, Sinicki and Cabrera |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced |