WI AB100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 46.977 (2) (a) and 54.15 (8) (a) 1. to 4.; to renumber and amend 46.977 (1) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 46.977 (1) (intro.) and (a); to amend 46.977 (2) (b) (intro.), 46.977 (2) (c), 54.15 (8) (a) (intro.) and 54.15 (8) (b); and to create 46.977 (3), 54.15 (8) (a) 2m. and 54.26 of the statutes; Relating to: guardian training requirements.
Title
Guardian training requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-27 | House | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor |
2021-10-27 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2021-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-27-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-10-21 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2021-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |