WI AB100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.69 (1) (a); to amend 30.69 (1) (b) and 30.69 (1) (c); and to create 30.69 (1) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: operating a motorboat towing a person on water skis.
Title
Operating a motorboat towing a person on water skis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-07-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jarchow |
2017-04-27 | House | Senator Kapenga withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2017-04-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-20 | House | Senator Craig added as a cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2017-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab100 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB100.pdf |