WI AB100 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 347.07 (2) (intro.); and to create 347.07 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: lighting underneath motorcycles.
Title
Lighting underneath motorcycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 27 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-19-2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jagler |
2015-03-31 | House | Representative Vorpagel added as a coauthor |
2015-03-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced |