WI AB100 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 948.055 (2) (a) and 948.055 (2) (b); to amend 948.055 (1); and to create 939.32 (1) (cr) and (de), 948.055 (2) (a) 2., 948.055 (2) (b) 2. and 971.23 (11) of the statutes; relating to: evidentiary recordings of persons under the age of 18 engaging in sexually explicit conduct and certain sex offenses against children and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Evidentiary recordings of persons under the age of 18 engaging in sexually explicit conduct and certain sex offenses against children and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | House | Published 4-26-2012 |
2012-04-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-12-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 284 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-19 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-12-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 88, Noes 7, Paired 2 |
2011-10-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | House | Assembly amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 86, Noes 10 |
2011-10-20 | House | Representative Turner withdrawn as a coauthor to Assembly amendment 1 |
2011-10-20 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-18 | House | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-09-13 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kessler and Turner |
2011-09-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-09-13 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2011-09-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-08-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-06-02 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2011-05-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-04-22 | House | Introduced |