WI AB1 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 71.06 (1q), 71.06 (1r) (a), 71.06 (1r) (b), 71.06 (1r) (c), 71.06 (2) (i), 71.06 (2) (j), 71.06 (2) (k), 71.06 (2) (km), 71.06 (2) (L), 71.06 (2) (Lm), 71.06 (2) (m), 71.06 (2) (mm), 71.06 (2e) (be), 71.06 (2e) (bm), 71.06 (2e) (bs), 71.06 (2s) (e), 71.06 (2s) (f), 71.06 (2s) (g) and 73.03 (71); to renumber 71.06 (1r) (d); to amend 71.06 (1q) (intro.), 71.06 (1r) (title), 71.06 (2) (i) (intro.), 71.06 (2) (j) (intro.), 71.06 (2e) (a), 71.06 (2e) (b), 71.06 (2m), 71.06 (2s) (d), 71.125 (1), 71.125 (2), 71.17 (6), 71.64 (9) (b) (intro.), 71.67 (5) (a), 71.67 (5m), 73.03 (71) (c) 2. and 73.03 (71) (d) 2.; and to create 71.06 (1r), 71.06 (2) (k), 71.06 (2) (km), 71.06 (2) (L), 71.06 (2) (Lm), 71.06 (2) (m), 71.06 (2) (mm), 71.06 (2) (n), 71.06 (2e) (be), 71.06 (2e) (bm), 71.06 (2e) (bs), 71.06 (2s) (e), 71.06 (2s) (f) and 71.06 (2s) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a flat individual income tax rate. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a flat individual income tax rate. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-02-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-01-26HouseRepresentative Donovan added as a coauthor
2023-01-23HouseRepresentative Moses added as a coauthor
2023-01-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-01-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback