WI AB1 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.42, 118.60 (2) (ag) 3., 118.60 (7) (a), 118.60 (10) (a) 4., 119.23 (2) (ag) 3., 119.23 (7) (a), 119.23 (10) (a) 4. and 121.006 (2) (d); to amend 118.153 (1) (a) 5., 118.30 (2) (b) 3., 118.30 (2) (b) 4., 118.30 (2) (b) 5., 118.30 (2) (b) 6., 118.33 (6) (a) 1., 118.33 (6) (b) 1., 118.33 (6) (c) 1., 118.33 (6) (cr) 1., 118.40 (2r) (bm), 118.40 (2r) (d) 2., 118.60 (7) (e) and 119.23 (7) (e); and to create 15.07 (1) (a) 6., 15.07 (3) (bm) 8., 15.375 (3), 20.255 (1) (fm), 115.28 (61), 115.28 (62), 115.385 (3), 115.39, 118.30 (8) and 118.40 (2r) (b) 1. e. of the statutes; Relating to: a school review system, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A school review system, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2015-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB1.pdf |