WA SJR8220 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Constitution to designate English as the official language of the state.
Title
Amending the Constitution to designate English as the official language of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2012-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8220&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Resolutions/8220.pdf |