WA SJM8003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying for a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution relating to fiscal restraints on the federal government, the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and terms of office for federal officials and for members of Congress.
Title
Applying for a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution relating to fiscal restraints on the federal government, the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and terms of office for federal officials and for members of Congress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HJM4006 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.