WA SB6889 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the governance and financing of the Washington state convention and trade center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the governance and financing of the Washington state convention and trade center.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-09 Effective date 7/13/2010.
2010-04-09 Chapter 15, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session.
2010-04-09 Governor signed.
2010-04-05 Delivered to Governor.
2010-04-05 Speaker signed.
2010-04-02 President signed.
2010-04-01 Passed final passage; yeas, 39; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 8.
2010-04-01 Senate concurred in House amendments.
2010-03-22 Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2010-03-22 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-03-22 Floor amendment
2010-03-20 Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
2010-03-20 Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 9.
2010-03-20 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-03-20 1st substitute bill substituted
2010-03-20 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2010-03-20 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-03-20 Minority; without recommendation.
2010-03-20 WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2010-03-19 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at TBA.
2010-03-17 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM.
2010-03-18 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback