WA SB6872 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Effective date 7/1/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Effective date 7/1/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medicaid nursing facility payments.
Title
Concerning medicaid nursing facility payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Effective date 7/1/2010*. | |
2010-05-04 | Chapter 34, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session PV. | |
2010-05-04 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-04-12 | President signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Floor amendment | |
2010-04-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-09 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. | |
2010-03-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |