WA SB6870 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Containing costs for services to sexually violent predators.
Title
Containing costs for services to sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-04-23 | Chapter 28, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-04-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-04-12 | President signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-04-12 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-19 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-18 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2010-03-18 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-18 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-18 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Held on second reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-11 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-10 | Held on third reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-10 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-10 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-10 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-03-09 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |