WA SB6868 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the reasons for which a manifest injustice disposition may be imposed upon a juvenile offender.
Title
Limiting the reasons for which a manifest injustice disposition may be imposed upon a juvenile offender.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |