WA SB6721 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax statute clarifications and technical corrections.
Title
Concerning tax statute clarifications and technical corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-16 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |