WA SB6665 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the initiative filing fee.
Title
Changing the initiative filing fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] |
Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-01 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |