WA SB6660 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving fiscal responsibility and budget discipline by replacing the spending limit with additional four-year balanced budget requirements.
Title
Improving fiscal responsibility and budget discipline by replacing the spending limit with additional four-year balanced budget requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 218, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |