WA SB6634 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing civil penalties for failure to comply with dairy nutrient management recordkeeping requirements.
Title
Establishing civil penalties for failure to comply with dairy nutrient management recordkeeping requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Ken Jacobsen [D] |
Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 6/10/2010*. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 84, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-19 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-19 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | ARED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. |