WA SB6622 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mitigating damage to crops caused by migrating waterfowl.
Title
Mitigating damage to crops caused by migrating waterfowl.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-03 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-03 | NROR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |