WA SB6570 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 3/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 3/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting timelines relating to the hospital safety net assessment.
Title
Adjusting timelines relating to the hospital safety net assessment.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] |
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 3/28/2014. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 143, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2790 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.