WA SB6570 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodating certain private transportation providers at designated transit only lanes on public highways.
Title
Accommodating certain private transportation providers at designated transit only lanes on public highways.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |