WA SB6565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing permissible methods of parking a motorcycle.
Title
Establishing permissible methods of parking a motorcycle.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 163, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |