WA SB6560 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring that no youth is discharged from a public system of care into homelessness.
Title
Ensuring that no youth is discharged from a public system of care into homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018*. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 157, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-23 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |