WA SB6544 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the future of work task force.
Title
Establishing the future of work task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 294, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Held on third reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | EDIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Economic Development & International Trade. |