WA SB6538 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the superior court judges' association.
Title
Concerning the superior court judges' association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2587 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.