WA SB6523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding higher education opportunities for certain students.
Title
Expanding higher education opportunities for certain students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Chapter 1, 2014 Laws. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-02-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |