WA SB6505 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Developing educational materials for assisting employees of self-insured employers entering claim resolution structured settlement agreements.
Title
Developing educational materials for assisting employees of self-insured employers entering claim resolution structured settlement agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-02 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-30 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-26 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6505&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6505.pdf |