WA SB6503 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing child support pass-through payments.
Title
Implementing child support pass-through payments.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2371 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-26 - Referred to Appropriations.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6503&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6503.pdf |