WA SB6493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency and accountability for intercollegiate athletic programs.
Title
Increasing transparency and accountability for intercollegiate athletic programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 292, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-23 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 5:45 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |