WA SB6491 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 4/1/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the availability of assisted outpatient behavioral health treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the availability of assisted outpatient behavioral health treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 4/1/2018*.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 291, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-22HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM.
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-30SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-30SenateHSC - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:45 PM.
2018-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6491&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6491.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6491-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6491-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6491-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6491-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6491&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6491&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6491&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2018

Bill Comments

feedback