WA SB6476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing and expanding access of inmates and immediate family members of inmates to services provided within correctional facilities.
Title
Increasing and expanding access of inmates and immediate family members of inmates to services provided within correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 319, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |