WA SB6459 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing peace officers to assist the department of corrections with the supervision of offenders.
Title
Authorizing peace officers to assist the department of corrections with the supervision of offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] |
Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 234, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-24 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |