WA SB6458 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions that establish the office of the insurance commissioner and replacing that office with a Washington state insurance board. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Addressing the office of the insurance commissioner and matters related to health care insurance. )
Title
Repealing provisions that establish the office of the insurance commissioner and replacing that office with a Washington state insurance board. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Addressing the office of the insurance commissioner and matters related to health care insurance. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |