WA SB6443 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of cigarettes and other tobacco products.
Title
Concerning the taxation of cigarettes and other tobacco products.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-20 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-20 | LCCP - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6443&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6443.pdf |