WA SB6435 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prioritizing existing funding for special safety corridor projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prioritizing existing funding for special safety corridor projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-02-01 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2012-01-23 First reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback