WA SB6426 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing schools to be sited as essential public facilities outside an urban growth area.
Title
Allowing schools to be sited as essential public facilities outside an urban growth area.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |