WA SB6408 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating body worn cameras.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating body worn cameras.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 285, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-02-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-01SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB2893 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-22 - First reading, referred to Judiciary

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback