WA SB6408 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changing remedies for actions under the public records act.
Title
Changing remedies for actions under the public records act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-01 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2910 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.